Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Milanes, Francisco A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Quigg, Vincent J, Swinton, Oscar R, against Ellington, Kincy S., Mike Lowrie Trucking, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2023 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 03, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 09, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: December 26, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 2024doc01812120240404133553
Date: April 04, 2024POS_Mike_Lowrie_Trucking_Inc_BCV_23_104240
Date: March 27, 2024POS - Kincy S. Ellington - BCV-23-104240
Date: March 26, 2024POS_Kincy_S_Ellington_BCV_23_104240
Date: March 25, 202488786Civil0283b2
Date: December 21, 202388786Compl01a9e0
Date: December 21, 202388786Summo00a7df
Date: December 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: VINCENT J QUIGG New Attorney: OSCAR R. SWINTON |
|
April 04, 2024 | Hearing |
Substitution of Attorneys Former Attorney: VINCENT J QUIGG New Attorney: OSCAR R. SWINTON |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | doc01812120240404133553 | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
April 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice re; Proof of Service |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | POS_Mike_Lowrie_Trucking_Inc_BCV_23_104240 | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Mike Lowrie Trucking, Inc., via personal service |
|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Mike Lowrie Trucking, Inc., via personal service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.