Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Zurich American Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sandoval, Katherine A., against Dhillon, Lovepreet Singh, Ekam Bar Western Transport, A California Corporation, Ekam Brar Western Transport, A California Corporation, represented by Dhillon, Summit S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 22, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: December 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 01, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 04, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 20, 2024Complaint
Date: December 04, 202394059DEFEN010850
Date: March 16, 202494059DEFEN0006d6
Date: March 16, 202493857Notic01e022
Date: March 13, 202493857Answe000fb0
Date: March 13, 2024Lovepreet Dhillon Affidavit of Service
Date: March 06, 2024POS 3853 (3)
Date: March 06, 2024POS 3853
Date: February 21, 2024Ekam Bar Affidavit of Service
Date: January 19, 2024Civil Case Coversheet
Date: December 04, 2023Summons
Date: December 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Answer - Caption box does not conform exact to the Complaint. Please review/correct and re-file. |
|
March 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Answer - Caption box does not conform exact to the Complaint. Please review/correct and re-file. |
|
March 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 94059DEFEN010850 | |
March 16, 2024 | Docket Event | 94059DEFEN0006d6 | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint | |
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees and Demand for Jury Trial |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | 93857Notic01e022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.