Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Starstone Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Zaiderman, Michael, against South Valley Farms, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 13, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: May 28, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: November 29, 202396752Reque00ae45
Date: April 25, 202491739Proof00dbd9
Date: February 09, 202487292Civil01a6e8
Date: November 27, 202387292Summo02aa7e
Date: November 27, 202387292Compl00edd1
Date: November 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 96752Reque00ae45 | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to South Valley Farms, via personal service |
|
February 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to South Valley Farms, via personal service |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 91739Proof00dbd9 | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/13/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T2 |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
November 29, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/13/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division: T2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.