Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Bravo, Erasmo, Bravo, Evangelina, Bravo, Manuel, Bravo, Mary, Erasmo Bravo, As Successor-In-Interest To Heron Bravo, Deceased, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Whittington, Mark Joseph, against Carlon, Abel, Golden Empire Security, La Mina Cantina, Vallejo, Anthony, represented by Frankenberger, David J, Seita, Carol Ann M., Woods, Sara J., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint is titled "HERON BRAVO, JR., ET AL. v. LA MINA CANTINA, ET AL." The plaintiffs in this case are Heron Bravo, Jr., Erasmo Bravo, Evangelina Bravo, Manuel Bravo, and Mary Bravo. The defendants named in the complaint are LA MINA CANTINA, ...
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 05, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 29, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: February 14, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 23, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 06, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 24, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 18, 2024Ruling
Date: March 20, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: November 21, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 202405-06-24 CMC Statement by Plaintiffs
Date: May 06, 202405-06-24 Notice of Posting Jury Fees by Plaintiffs
Date: May 06, 20242024.04.15 D La Mina Cantina Answer (A7537201xDBB43)
Date: April 29, 202496610Notic0379c6
Date: April 24, 202496610Cross01d2ea
Date: April 24, 202496610Answe003bf8
Date: April 24, 202496610Summo0297a0
Date: April 24, 2024First Amended Complaint-Bravo vs. La Mina Cantina
Date: March 18, 2024FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 202491474Defen006475
Date: February 06, 202490656Defen005353
Date: January 24, 2024901272142403a0bf
Date: January 17, 202490127DECLA02444c
Date: January 17, 202490127214240069c0
Date: January 17, 202490127DEFEN01a2a0
Date: January 17, 202496664SUMMO03cbcb
Date: April 24, 202496664CROSS02e7e3
Date: April 24, 202496664NOTIC016b77
Date: April 24, 202496664DEFEN00439b
Date: April 24, 2024Summons (1)
Date: November 16, 2023Complaint- FINAL
Date: November 16, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet (3)
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT: OUTDATED FORM. PLEASE USE FORM CM-110 WITH DATE REV. JANUARY 1, 2024 |
|
May 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees for Plaintiffs |
|
May 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT: OUTDATED FORM. PLEASE USE FORM CM-110 WITH DATE REV. JANUARY 1, 2024 |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees for Plaintiffs |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 05-06-24 CMC Statement by Plaintiffs | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | 05-06-24 Notice of Posting Jury Fees by Plaintiffs | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Answer- First Amended Complaint filed 03/18/2024. First Amended Complaint supersedes complaint filed 11/16/2023. Caption under the case number does not reflect the operative complaint. Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Review verbiage as to all parties including the " does". Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. |
|
April 29, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
April 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Answer- First Amended Complaint filed 03/18/2024. First Amended Complaint supersedes complaint filed 11/16/2023. Caption under the case number does not reflect the operative complaint. Caption does not conform exact to complaint. Review verbiage as to all parties including the " does". Please ensure caption conforms exact to operative complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.