Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Sigi Tehachapi, Llc, A Texas Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Warren, Robert J, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint Adverse To Plaintiff'S Title, Or Any Cloud On Plaintiff'S Title Thereto, Clearvista Energy, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Clearvista Ranch Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Cervantes, Gina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCervantes, Gina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2023 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint is filed by SIGI Tehachapi, LLC, a Texas limited liability company, against Clearvista Ranch LLC, Clearvista Energy LLC, and other unknown defendants. SIGI Tehachapi, LLC owns two parcels of vacant land in Kern County, California, and ...
Case Management Conference
Date: May 15, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 14, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 05, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 19, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: November 17, 2023Default
Date: April 18, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 13, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 27, 2024SIGI - Order
Date: April 12, 2024SIGI - Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 12, 20243.27.24 App for Court Judgment
Date: March 27, 2024PLFS BRIEF ISO REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT(6074063.1)(6077299.1)
Date: March 27, 2024CLIENT DEC ISO REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT(Signed)
Date: March 27, 20243.27.24 Default_Setting_card
Date: March 27, 2024Dec of RJW ISO Request for Court Judgment
Date: March 27, 2024Proposed Judgment
Date: March 27, 2024Compendium of Evidence ISO Judgment rfs
Date: March 27, 2024Proposed Judgment
Date: March 12, 2024Compendium of Evidence ISO Judgment rfs
Date: March 12, 2024CLIENT DEC ISO REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT(Signed)
Date: March 12, 2024Default_Setting_card
Date: March 12, 2024Dec of RJW ISO Request for Court Judgment
Date: March 12, 2024RFD Does
Date: March 12, 2024PLFS BRIEF ISO REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT(6074063.1)(6077299.1)
Date: March 12, 2024Request for Court Judgment
Date: March 12, 2024executed Default i
Date: February 26, 2024executed Default ii
Date: February 26, 2024POS For Proof of Publication (APU) (i)
Date: February 14, 2024POS For Proof of Publication (APU) (ii)
Date: February 14, 20241.17.24 Request for Entry of Default Clearvista Ranch (2)
Date: January 19, 20241.17.24 Request for Entry of Default Clearvista Energy (2)
Date: January 18, 20241.17.24 Request for Entry of Default Clearvista Ranch (2)
Date: January 18, 20241.17.24 Request for Entry of Default Clearvista Ranch
Date: January 17, 20241.17.24 Request for Entry of Default Clearvista Energy
Date: January 17, 2024POS For Proof of Publication
Date: January 04, 2024POS - Clearvista Ranch SOS
Date: December 21, 2023POS - Clearvista Energy SOS(6020306.1)
Date: December 14, 2023POS - Posting Parcel 2(6020308.1)
Date: December 14, 2023POS - Clearvista Ranch SOS(6020305.1)
Date: December 14, 2023POS - Posting Parcel 1(6020307.1)
Date: December 14, 2023POS - Posting Parcel 2
Date: December 08, 2023POS - Posting Parcel 1
Date: December 08, 2023POS - Clearvista Energy SOS
Date: December 08, 2023Ex Parte App for Substituted Service through Secretary of State
Date: November 29, 2023Proposed Order for Substituted Service SOS
Date: November 29, 2023Proposed Order on Ex Parte
Date: November 17, 2023Ex Parte App for Service by Publication(5162745.2)
Date: November 17, 2023VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: November 14, 202311.13 Summons
Date: November 14, 202311.13 CCCS
Date: November 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC-NFT (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Cervantes, Gina M. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Default Prove-up Judge: Cervantes, Gina M. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Default 04/18/2024 Default Prove-up |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Order regarding Remote Appearance (RA-020)
Judge: Cervantes, Gina M. |
|
April 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010) Next hrg. 4/18/24 |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010) Next hrg. 4/18/24 |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | SIGI - Order | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | SIGI - Notice of Remote Appearance | |
March 27, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Court Judgment As to Clearvista Ranch LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Clearvista Energy, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; All Persons unknown, claiming by, under, or through Clearvista Energy, LLC ; All Persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title , estate, lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, or any cloud on plaintiff's title thereto on complaint filed 11/13/23 |
|
March 27, 2024 | Hearing | Brief In support of Court Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.