Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Kamari Ridgle, As An Aggrieved Employee Pursuant To The Private Attorneys General Act, Kamari Ridgle, On Behalf Of The State Of California And Other Non-Party Aggrieved Employees, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Pike, Bevin E A, against Core-Mark Distributors, Inc., Core-Mark International, Inc., Core-Mark Interrelated Companies, Inc., Core-Mark Midcontinent, Inc., Kenneth O. Lester Company, Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Azzara, Philip J, Chan, Lyle M., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2023 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: November 16, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 16, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 14, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 29, 2024Ruling
Date: December 06, 2023Ridgle - Stipulation
Date: April 12, 2024Answer - Kenneth O. Lester Company Inc.
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Core-Mark Midcontinent Inc.
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Core-Mark Interrelated Companies Inc.
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Performance Food Group Inc.
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Core-Mark Distributors Inc.
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Performance Food Group Company
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Performance Transportation LLC
Date: January 19, 2024Answer - Core-Mark International Inc.
Date: January 19, 20242023 12-04 Summons to Complaint
Date: December 27, 20232023 12-04 PLD-MOT to Disqualify Barmann Jr
Date: December 04, 20232023 11-13 PLD-Summons - (Final)
Date: November 16, 20232023 11-13 PLD-Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 13, 20232023 11-13 PLD-COM Ridgle v. Core-Mark
Date: November 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order to Stay Plaintiff's Individual PAGA Claims Submitted to Binding Arbitration Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Stay Plaintiff's Individual PAGA Claims Submitted to Binding Arbitration |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Ridgle - Stipulation | |
February 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
January 23, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Insufficient Filing Fees | |
January 19, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer - Kenneth O. Lester Company Inc. | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer - Core-Mark Midcontinent Inc. | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer - Core-Mark Interrelated Companies Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.