Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Insurance Company Of The West, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gascou, Christian J, against Alternative Care, Inc, Alternative Care, Inc., An Unknown Business Entity, Gables Residential Care, Llc, Kern Alternative Care, Inc., represented by Belden, T Scott, Lewis, Chelsea K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2023 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Insurance Company of the West (ICW) against Kern Alternative Care, Inc., Gables Residential Care, LLC, Alternative Care, Inc., and 20 unknown defendants. ICW alleges that the defendants failed to pay outsta...
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 21, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 18, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: November 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 13, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 17, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 10, 20242024.4.17 NRA as Served
Date: April 17, 2024FINAL Answer to Complaint
Date: February 29, 2024FINAL Stip to Set Aside Default
Date: February 13, 20242024.2.1 Default as Served
Date: February 01, 2024Alternative Care Inc. POS
Date: January 12, 2024Gables Residential Care LLC POS
Date: January 12, 2024Kern Alternative Care Inc. POS
Date: January 12, 2024Gables Residential Care LLC POS
Date: December 28, 2023Alternative Care Inc. POS
Date: December 28, 2023Kern Alternative Care Inc. POS
Date: December 28, 20232023.11.3 Complaint as Served
Date: November 03, 20232023.11.3 Civil Case Cover Sheet as Served
Date: November 03, 20232023.11.3 Summons as Served
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL CMC Statement for 5-6-24 | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Case Management Statement. REASON: Please list the address of Dept T-2 below the hearing date. The address is 3131 Arrow St. Bakersfield, Ca. 93308. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement for Plaintiff, Insurance Company of the West |
|
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement for Plaintiff, Insurance Company of the West |
|
April 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Case Management Statement. REASON: Please list the address of Dept T-2 below the hearing date. The address is 3131 Arrow St. Bakersfield, Ca. 93308. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.4.18 CMS as Served | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Case management statement. Reason: Form CM -110 revised 9/1/2021 is outdated. Must use mandatory judicial council form CM -110 revised 1/1/2024 |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.