Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club, An Insurance Exchange, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Haines, Todd F, against Rivas, Jaime Villa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2023 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: April 22, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 07, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: October 25, 2023420-2128xx
Date: February 10, 202411_23B53910
Date: December 18, 202320231001866_COM
Date: October 24, 202320231001866_SUM
Date: October 24, 202320231001866_CCCS
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) in re: entry of default judgment |
|
July 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) in re: entry of default judgment Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Entered as to Jaime Villa Rivas on Complaint filed 10/24/2023 |
|
February 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default Entered as to Jaime Villa Rivas on Complaint filed 10/24/2023 |
|
February 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 420-2128xx | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Jaime Villa Rivas via sub service |
|
December 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Jaime Villa Rivas via sub service |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 11_23B53910 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.