Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Management Conference
Date: April 22, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 06, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: October 24, 2023420-2089xx
Date: February 04, 202411_23B53911
Date: December 26, 202320231001421_COM
Date: October 23, 202320231001421_SUM
Date: October 23, 202320231001421_CCCS
Date: October 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
February 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
February 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Entry of Default Entered as to Evaristo Nunez, an individual, also known as Evaristo Ricado Nunez IV on Complaint filed 10/23/2023 |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Entered as to Evaristo Nunez, an individual, also known as Evaristo Ricado Nunez IV on Complaint filed 10/23/2023 |
|
February 04, 2024 | Docket Event | 420-2089xx | |
December 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Evaristo Nunez an individual also known as Evaristo Ricado Nunez IV via sub service |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint as to Evaristo Nunez an individual also known as Evaristo Ricado Nunez IV via sub service |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 11_23B53911 | |
October 24, 2023 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
October 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 02/06/2024 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.