Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Darryl Rogers, For Others Similarly Situated, Rogers, Darryl, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Fitz, Carl, Hogg, William Marshall, against Nes Global, Llc, represented by Gitig, Eric J., Jatana, Nicky, Tong, Jing, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 09, 2023 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: April 08, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 22, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: October 09, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 08, 2024Ps Notice of Jury Deposit - Rogers
Date: April 22, 202495717NOTIC003361
Date: April 10, 202494906CaseM006997
Date: March 28, 2024POS re Ps CMC Stmnt - Rogers
Date: March 27, 2024Ps Initial CMC Stmnt - Rogers
Date: March 27, 20242024.01.19 POS for Written Disco (Set One)
Date: February 07, 20242024.01.31 Proof of Service - RFAs (Set 2)
Date: February 07, 20242024.01.15 Proof of Service (Rogers)
Date: January 15, 202487402Answe00bf26
Date: November 29, 2023Ps NOA CF
Date: November 09, 2023(28510352) Affidavit
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference continued from 04/08/2024 - plaintiffs counsel did not appear - to post fees Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference 04/08/2024 Case Management Conference continued from 04/08/2024 - plaintiffs counsel did not appear - to post fees |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees for Plaintiff, Darryl Rogers |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees for Plaintiff, Darryl Rogers |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Ps Notice of Jury Deposit - Rogers | |
April 10, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Ruling | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | 95717NOTIC003361 | |
April 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference 04/08/2024 Case Management Conference Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 28, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | 94906CaseM006997 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.