Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Moore, Thomas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Abreu, Alivia Elise, against Nash, Elizabeth Renee, Nash, Rebecca, Nash, Ricki, Senining, Catherine, Senining, Randolph, (total of 7) See All represented by Tercero, Napoleon G, Iii, Young, El Mahdi, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: October 03, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 16, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 26, 202494968Answe0066a1
Date: March 29, 202494967Answe002367
Date: March 29, 202494968CaseM0058dc
Date: March 29, 202494703CaseM00d2e5
Date: March 26, 202494443Notic027ee5
Date: March 22, 202494443Deman01faef
Date: March 22, 202494443CaseM00d4d8
Date: March 22, 202494386Notic0213f2
Date: March 21, 202494386Notic01ec08
Date: March 21, 202494386Answe001981
Date: March 21, 202494387Answe0096b1
Date: March 21, 2024CMC Stmt-Senining.
Date: March 04, 2024SUMM on XC
Date: February 14, 2024ANS TO COMPL
Date: February 14, 2024CROSS COMPL
Date: February 14, 2024JURY FEES
Date: February 14, 2024Proof_Of_Service_69590
Date: January 16, 2024Proof_Of_Service_69589
Date: January 16, 2024Proof_Of_Service_69588
Date: January 12, 2024Proof_Of_Service_69586
Date: January 12, 2024Proof_Of_Service_69587
Date: January 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial PL/DEF JT T/E: 10 Days |
|
July 18, 2025 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference PL/DEF JT 07/21/2025 T/E: 10 DAYS |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice RE: Case Management Statement. The form is outdated. Please use the 2024 revised form. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Case Management Conference Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 01/16/24 |
|
April 02, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 01/16/24 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94968Answe0066a1 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94967Answe002367 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94968CaseM0058dc | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice Case Management Statement: The first appearance fees of defendants Rebecca Nash and Ricki Nash have not yet been paid and this e-filing submission does not include those fees. Please resubmit the document with the appropriate filing fees. Please see the 03/26/24 Notices of Insufficient Filing Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.