Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Guerra, Olivia, Guerra, Roberto, Guerra, Rogelio, Guerra, Savannah, Munoz, Olga, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nielsen, Jonathan L, against Garcia, Joe, Interstate 2010-1 Fund Llc, represented by Mcadam, Leslie A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Final Case Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2025Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 16, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 02, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: October 02, 2023RFD - Joe Garcia - scanned
Date: April 17, 202494326CaseM0071b6
Date: March 20, 2024Notice to Post Jury fees - scanned
Date: March 06, 2024CMS - scanned
Date: March 06, 2024POS - interstate
Date: October 17, 202386226Answe00585e
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2025 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/02/2024 Jury Trial PL JT T/E: 5-7 Days |
|
August 11, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial PL JT T/E: 5-7 Days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
August 08, 2025 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/02/2024 Final Case Management Conference PL JT 08/11/25 T/E: 5-7 Days |
|
August 08, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference PL JT 08/11/25 T/E: 5-7 Days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
July 11, 2025 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TE: 5-7 days; FCMC: 8/8/25 1:30pm Div H; JT: 8/11/25 9am Div H Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
July 11, 2025 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TE: 5-7 days; FCMC: 8/8/25 1:30pm Div H; JT: 8/11/25 9am Div H |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to defendant Joe Garcia; without prejudice |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Partial) as to defendant Joe Garcia; without prejudice |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | RFD - Joe Garcia - scanned | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 04/02/2024 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 cont'd from 01/16/24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.