Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
United Wisconsin Insurance Company, Administered By American Claims Management, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Johnsen, Gregory F, against Four Star Fruit, Murallo, Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2023 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 23, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 18, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: August 15, 2023Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: April 02, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 18, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 28, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 18, 2024Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: February 13, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 02, 202494160Respo0174ba
Date: March 19, 202494160CaseM00151d
Date: March 19, 2024Cross-Complaint
Date: March 13, 2024Summons to Cross-Complaint
Date: March 13, 2024Demand for and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees
Date: March 13, 2024Answer to Complaint
Date: March 13, 202480478Compl0050d2
Date: August 10, 202380478Civil013345
Date: August 10, 202380478Summo02e8e7
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 11/28/2023 Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 continued from 04/02/2024 |
|
July 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference continued from04/02/2024 |
|
July 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 continued from 04/02/2024 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
July 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference continued from04/02/2024 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Cross complaint - Attorney for section reflects second defendant who has not appeared in the case "Carlos Murillo". |
|
April 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Cross complaint - Attorney for section reflects second defendant who has not appeared in the case "Carlos Murillo". |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer_to_Complaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons_to_CrossComplaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CrossComplaint | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Deposit_of_Jury_Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.