Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Curtis, Irene Helen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ghermezian, Raymond, against City Of Bakersfield, Community Action Partnership Of Kern, County Of Kern, represented by Bruce, William A, Demaria, Anthony N, Gutcher, Stephanie Virrey, Holmes, Kyle W, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause
Date: July 26, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 26, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 08, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 22, 2024Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: March 11, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: March 11, 2024COB- Memo of Costs Summary and Work Sheet (2)
Date: April 26, 2024COB- Delclaration of WAB
Date: April 10, 2024COB- MTC Verified Responses & Sanctions
Date: April 10, 2024COB - Reply to Opposition
Date: March 04, 202492921DECLA000e7d
Date: February 29, 2024COB- Declaration
Date: February 13, 2024COB- MTC
Date: February 13, 2024COB- Motion to Deem Matters Admitted
Date: February 13, 2024Curtis_CMC_Statement
Date: January 04, 202488730Notic010daa
Date: December 20, 202388730CaseM00c086
Date: December 20, 2023Civil case_012
Date: July 20, 2023Complaint_020
Date: July 20, 2023New summ
Date: August 08, 2023Affidavit
Date: August 21, 202381424Reque00ebca
Date: August 24, 2023POS City
Date: August 29, 2023POS MStreet
Date: August 29, 2023(22885556)9342765
Date: August 29, 2023(27367169) Affidavit (1)
Date: August 29, 202382425Defen005a16
Date: September 08, 2023Curtis_ANSWER_TO_COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2023COB- Answer to Complaint
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 09, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 09, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days |
|
May 09, 2025 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TRIAL/FCMC 6/9/25, DEPT 17, T/E 7 DAYS |
|
May 09, 2025 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TRIAL/FCMC 6/9/25, DEPT 17, T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed 4/10/24. City of Bakersfield. Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Further Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set 1) Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed 4/10/24. City of Bakersfield. Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Verified Further Responses to Form Interrogatories (Set 1) |
|
April 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Memorandum of Costs City of Bakersfield Memo of Costs Summary and Work Sheet |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs City of Bakersfield Memo of Costs Summary and Work Sheet |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | COB- Memo of Costs Summary and Work Sheet (2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.