Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Kerste, Kendra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edmonston, Craig A, against Etcheverry, Aramee J., Jordan, Larry, represented by Dewey, Brian S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: May 10, 2024Ruling
Date: March 14, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: June 30, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 04, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 30, 2023Ruling
Date: November 21, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: October 13, 202395217Reque00dbc1
Date: April 03, 2024doc11904020240313101353
Date: March 13, 202487975CaseM000793
Date: December 07, 2023doc10863820230630092344
Date: June 30, 2023doc11011120230814082424
Date: August 15, 2023doc10997320230809114209
Date: August 15, 202381310Answe00cb16
Date: August 23, 202381310Deman02a74b
Date: August 23, 202381310Notic0129e4
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS JURY FOR PL & DEF |
|
May 27, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 27, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS JURY FOR PL & DEF Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 02, 2025 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TRIAL/FCMC 5/27/25, DEPT 17, T/E 7 DAYS Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 02, 2025 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference TRIAL/FCMC 5/27/25, DEPT 17, T/E 7 DAYS |
|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/14/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 |
|
May 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal crc 3.1385 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 03, 2024 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | 95217Reque00dbc1 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/14/2024 Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.