Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Young, Emanuel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Arshakyan, Tina T, Oganesyan-Agadjanian, Nazelie, against Devonshire Inn Motel, Erros Logistics Inc, Kristina Cohick, Matthew Cohick, represented by Bortz, Arthur N, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Smith, T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Management Conference
Date: November 06, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 22, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: May 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 18, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 12, 202396673Separ022471
Date: April 24, 202496673Separ01147b
Date: April 24, 202496673Separ032157
Date: April 24, 202496673Motio003d6d
Date: April 24, 202487569CaseM006458
Date: November 30, 2023Def_s_Further_Case_Management_Statement
Date: November 30, 202386916Notic004f2b
Date: November 17, 202379372Amend00860d
Date: July 21, 202380993Proof00d14e
Date: August 18, 2023Young_Answer_to_Complaint
Date: September 15, 2023Young_Answer_to_Complaint_2
Date: September 18, 202384802Reque000d5c
Date: October 17, 202385103CaseM001982
Date: October 20, 2023Case_Management_Statement_Young_v_Erros
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
February 24, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury |
|
February 14, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 02/14/25 // TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
February 14, 2025 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 02/14/25 // TE: 7 days // Plaintiff's jury |
|
January 31, 2025 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer Plaintiff Reserved 4/24/2024 due by 4/29/2024 Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Nazelie 818-334-5005 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer Plaintiff Reserved 4/24/2024 due by 4/29/2024 Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Nazelie 818-334-5005 |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96673Separ022471 | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96673Separ01147b | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 96673Separ032157 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.