Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Watson, Wendy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by O'Dell, Seth N, against Kc Vonjon, Inc., Vaagen, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)
Date: March 05, 2024Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: March 28, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: April 10, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: July 11, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 11, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 15, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: September 25, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: October 25, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 08, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 05, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: March 28, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 17, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: March 05, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 18, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: March 05, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 10, 2024doc12817420240423170823
Date: April 24, 2024doc12726820240410171750
Date: April 11, 2024doc12703820240408134140
Date: April 08, 2024doc12700120240405160747
Date: April 05, 2024doc12692420240405132023
Date: April 05, 2024doc12692320240405131925
Date: April 05, 2024doc12692220240405131916
Date: April 05, 2024doc12692120240405131909
Date: April 05, 2024doc12692520240405132300
Date: April 05, 2024doc12690520240405095329
Date: April 05, 2024doc12644020240322081058
Date: March 22, 2024doc12643920240322081040
Date: March 22, 2024doc12643820240322081028
Date: March 22, 2024doc12643720240322081018
Date: March 22, 2024doc12573320240306144654
Date: March 06, 2024doc12558720240305094732
Date: March 05, 2024doc12544520240229155617
Date: March 01, 2024doc12451920240206152037
Date: February 06, 2024doc12452020240206152100
Date: February 06, 2024doc12419520240129143403
Date: January 29, 2024doc12382420240119120729
Date: January 19, 2024doc12305320240103090055
Date: January 03, 2024Order Sec of State.docx
Date: December 19, 2023doc12266320231218162236
Date: December 19, 2023doc12263620231215171007
Date: December 16, 2023doc12263520231215170943
Date: December 16, 2023doc12256320231214095019
Date: December 14, 20232023_12_05_Vaagen_Substitution_of_Attorney
Date: December 05, 2023doc11600820230802074307
Date: August 02, 2023doc11805520230911082402
Date: September 11, 2023CMC_final
Date: September 12, 2023doc11814320230912150424
Date: September 12, 20232023_11_02_Vaagen_Notice_of_Handling_Attorney
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/25/23, 10/25/23, 01/11/24, 04/10/24 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
July 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/25/23, 10/25/23, 01/11/24, 04/10/24 |
|
May 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 4/22/24 due: 4/25/24; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; contact: Philip 661-326-1611 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 4/22/24 due: 4/25/24; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; contact: Philip 661-326-1611 |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12817420240423170823 | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Judgment - Missing required Dismissal of Does Does must be named or Dismissed prior to requesting Judgment |
|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Judgment - Missing required Dismissal of Does Does must be named or Dismissed prior to requesting Judgment |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | doc12726820240410171750 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 04/10/2024 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/25/23, 10/25/23, 01/11/24 |
|
April 10, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Further Case Management Conference held 4/10/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.