Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Zuniga-Diaz, Nayvi Isabel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Azimtash, Sam, Khoubian, Alexander, against H&Amp;B Group, Inc., H & B Group, Inc., H&B Group, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., represented by Nassihi, Amir, Polyakov, David, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Motion to Compel
Date: June 12, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 11, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 22, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 11, 2023Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: September 26, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: August 28, 2023Ruling
Date: March 22, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: August 17, 2023Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: July 27, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 07, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: February 27, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 12, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 25, 2024Complaint
Date: February 24, 2023Zuniga-Diaz NOS final
Date: March 18, 202487942APPEL005ac1
Date: December 07, 202387942APPEL01efbd
Date: December 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 24, 2023Summons
Date: February 24, 2023POS DJP 19896320 Tyler - signed
Date: March 01, 2023Attorney Certified SS Bus Mariah 19896321-
Date: March 08, 2023Zuniga-Diaz v. Nissan - Decl. AK - OSC
Date: July 20, 2023Zuniga-Diaz v. Nissan - Decl. SA - OSC
Date: July 20, 2023Zuniga-Diaz - Nissans Response to OSC
Date: July 21, 2023Zuniga Diaz Opp to MTC Arb
Date: August 03, 2023Zuniga-Diaz Reply
Date: August 10, 2023Zuniga cms
Date: August 15, 2023Zuniga-Diaz Amended CMC stmt
Date: August 16, 2023CMS - Zuniga-Diaz v. NNA
Date: August 17, 2023Zuniga-Diaz v. NNA - NPJF
Date: August 17, 2023Zuniga v. NNA - amended CMC
Date: August 17, 2023Zuinga-Diaz v. NNS - PO v2
Date: August 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/22/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385 |
|
September 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
September 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 5 DAYS |
|
September 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 5 DAYS Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
September 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 09/23/24 0930 DIV J T/E: 5 DAYS |
|
September 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 09/23/24 0930 DIV J T/E: 5 DAYS Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
August 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC 9/20/2024 (J) Trial 9/23/2024 (J) T/E 5 days |
|
August 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC 9/20/2024 (J) Trial 9/23/2024 (J) T/E 5 days Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 03/22/2024 Ruling |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement - Conditional |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.