Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
California Coast Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Lisa Maloney, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Zulfa, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
Category09-Cv Other Collections-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Maloney Lisa- ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FINAL
Date: February 04, 202380550Motio000236
Date: August 11, 202380550DECLA01d619
Date: August 11, 202380550Propo052ef5
Date: August 11, 202380550DECLA02abd2
Date: August 11, 202380550MOVIN03b612
Date: August 11, 202380550Propo04f90c
Date: August 11, 20239798.0002 nos
Date: October 25, 20239798.0002 with
Date: October 25, 20239798.0002 rfd
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
February 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E: 1/2 day Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
January 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 28, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal CRC 3.1385 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 9798.0002 rfd | |
November 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With Prejudice |
|
November 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 8/11/2023 PL MSJ Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
November 01, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared MSJ/MSA/Anti-Slapp 8/2/2023 letter due 8/7/2023 PL MSJ Jorge Luna: 714-547-2444 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 9798.0002 nos | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 9798.0002 with |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.