Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Gutierrez, Marlon Alfredo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Aumais, Christopher T., against Calderon, Jonathan, represented by Manesh, Victoria F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 06, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: June 23, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: September 21, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 23, 2023Ruling
Date: September 11, 2023Ruling
Date: May 04, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: September 21, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 23, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: December 08, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 05, 2023Ruling
Date: June 27, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 05, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 20, 20232024.04.22 Gutierrez CMC Statement
Date: April 22, 2024BUTTRY801a
Date: April 22, 2024BUTTRY801b
Date: April 22, 2024BUTTRY458
Date: February 27, 2024Gutierrez - POS Calderon sub service
Date: January 17, 2024DEC. OF JEREMY S. BERMAN RE OSC
Date: December 01, 2023Gutierrez CMC STATEMENT
Date: November 21, 2023Gutierrez summons corrected
Date: December 08, 20222023.03.06 GUTIERREZ Jury Fees
Date: March 06, 202372640Decla00995f
Date: March 18, 2023DEC OF JSB IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR PUB
Date: September 09, 2023Application and Order for Publication (1)
Date: September 09, 20232023.09.06 Gutierrez v. Calderon CMC
Date: September 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 06/23/23, 09/21/23, 12/05/23, 02/06/24 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 06/23/23, 09/21/23, 12/05/23, 02/06/24 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.04.22 Gutierrez CMC Statement | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | BUTTRY801a | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | BUTTRY801b | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
April 22, 2024 | Hearing | Case Management Statement | |
February 27, 2024 | Hearing | Answer to Complaint | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | BUTTRY458 | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 02/06/2024 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 06/23/23, 09/21/23, 12/05/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.