Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Cal-West Rain, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Artenian, Lawrence M, Hebesha, Amanda G, against Westland Farms Llc, A California Limited Liability, Yin, Sithol, represented by Beckman, Peter W, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2022 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Motion to Compel
Date: August 09, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Date: February 29, 2024Court Trial
Date: March 25, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 27, 2024Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf
Date: June 09, 2023Ruling
Date: December 04, 2023Ruling
Date: January 16, 2024Order to Show Cause
Date: November 23, 2022Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 09, 2023Final Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: August 09, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: February 05, 2024Court Trial
Date: March 26, 2024Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further
Date: March 13, 2024Plaintiff's Closing Brief
Date: April 24, 2024Amended Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcript (01765109)
Date: March 20, 202493939Witne0178d4
Date: March 14, 202493939Trial009cf8
Date: March 14, 2024Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses from Courtroom (01760733)
Date: March 08, 2024Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcript (01760734)
Date: March 08, 2024Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 Re Settlement Negotiations (01760731)
Date: March 08, 2024Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List (01760730)
Date: March 08, 2024Plaintiff's Trial Witness List (01760721)
Date: March 08, 2024Plaintiff's Trial Brief (01760729)
Date: March 08, 2024proposed Order Regarding Remote Appearance re 3-15-24 Final CMC (01754232)
Date: February 28, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance re 3-15-24 Final CMC (01754159)
Date: February 28, 2024Stipulation for Order to Continue Trial and Related Deadlines (01706974)
Date: December 06, 2023Proof of Service of Summons [Geri Tran - Agent] (01523861)
Date: December 13, 202269841Answe0078fb
Date: January 25, 2023MTC FI#1 - Reply (01637447)
Date: August 02, 2023MTC RPD#1 - Notice of Remote Appearance (01637442)
Date: August 02, 2023MTC RPD#1 - Reply (01637445)
Date: August 02, 2023MTC RFA#1 - Notice of Remote Appearance (01637443)
Date: August 02, 2023MTC FI#1 - Notice of Remote Appearance (01637444)
Date: August 02, 2023MTC RFA#1 - Reply (01637446)
Date: August 02, 202380252Decla007ecd
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Closing Brief | |
April 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Trial Brief Plaintiff's Closing Brief in Support of its Complaint for Breach of Contract and Quantum Meruit |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Plaintiff's Closing Brief in Support of its Complaint for Breach of Contract and Quantum Meruit |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 03/26/2024 Court Trial Day 2 of 2 |
|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Witness List (Combined) Clerk's List |
|
March 26, 2024 | Hearing | Exhibit(s) List | |
March 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial Day 2 of 2 Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Witness List (Combined) Clerk's List |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 03/25/2024 Court Trial T/E: 2DAYS |
|
March 25, 2024 | Hearing | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.