Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Alvarado, Kimi, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ramirez, April, against Fastrip Food Stores, Inc., represented by Waldon, Grover H, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Zulfa, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kimi Alvarado against Fastrip Food Stores, Inc. and Does 1 to 50. The complaint alleges personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is the Superior Court of California...
Further Case Management Conference
Date: March 14, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: October 16, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: September 26, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 09, 2023Ruling
Date: January 17, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 20232024.03.12 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: March 13, 20242024.02.28 Pls CMS (Alvarado)
Date: February 29, 2024Case Management Statement-3-EF
Date: February 28, 20242024.01.03 Pls CMS
Date: January 04, 2024Case Management Statement-2-EF
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE TRIAL CONTINUANCE-EF
Date: December 20, 2023Stipulation to Cont. Trial-EF
Date: December 11, 20232022.09.22 Summons
Date: September 22, 20222022.09.22 Complaint
Date: September 22, 20222022.09.22 Civil Case Cover
Date: September 22, 20222022.12.09 POS - Fastrip
Date: December 28, 2022ANSWER-EF
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE-POSTING JURY FEES-EF
Date: March 10, 2023Case Management Statement-EF
Date: March 10, 20232023.03.13 Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 14, 20232023.03.13 Pls CMS
Date: March 14, 2023Compendium of Evidence ISO MTC Docs at Depo
Date: August 22, 2023Pls MTC Docs at Fastrip PMQs Depo
Date: August 22, 2023Pls SS iso MTC Docs at Fastrip PMQs depo
Date: August 22, 20232023.08.31 Pls Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 06, 2023Proposed Order.doc
Date: October 19, 2023POS
Date: October 19, 2023Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline-EF
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 7DAYS ALL PARTIES JT Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
May 19, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 7DAYS ALL PARTIES JT |
|
May 09, 2025 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 5/19/25 T/E 7DAYS |
|
May 09, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 5/19/25 T/E 7DAYS Judge: Smith, T. Mark |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 19, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 04/22/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 04/22/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR BOTH SIDES. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days |
|
March 22, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 4/22/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.