Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Zepeda, Eloisa V., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wood, Carey B, against General Motors Llc, represented by Pappas, Alexandria O, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Motion to Compel
Date: June 05, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 04, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: March 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 25, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: September 14, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 28, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 14, 202296505Oppos008dc7
Date: April 22, 202495642PLAIN0038a9
Date: April 10, 202494751Propo029a28
Date: March 27, 202494751Decla01c704
Date: March 27, 202494751Motio0047e7
Date: March 27, 202463231Civil0251a3
Date: September 09, 202263231COMPL0090ec
Date: September 09, 202263530Summo00746c
Date: September 16, 202264384Proof00fdb2
Date: October 04, 202265450Answe00dfb5
Date: October 25, 202270576Notic0132f7
Date: February 09, 202370576CaseM00f5e6
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days |
|
October 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 21, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 7 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC/JT: 10/21/2024 // T/E: 7 DAYS (D-17) |
|
September 20, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC/JT: 10/21/2024 // T/E: 7 DAYS (D-17) Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Field 3/27/24 Plaintiff Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant's Person Most Qualified |
|
May 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion to Compel Field 3/27/24 Plaintiff Motion to Compel the Deposition of Defendant's Person Most Qualified Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/26/24 due: 3/29/24; Plaintiff's MTC Person Most Knowledgeable of Defendant; contact: Attorney Bobby Walker 310-442-1410 ext 138 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Substantive/Demurrer 3/26/24 due: 3/29/24; Plaintiff's MTC Person Most Knowledgeable of Defendant; contact: Attorney Bobby Walker 310-442-1410 ext 138 |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition General motors LLC s Memorandum of points and Authorities in opposition to Plaintiff s motion to compel the deposition of general Motors LLC s person(s) most Qualified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.