Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Duran, Cristina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Johnson, Craig E, against Foulkes, Audrey, represented by Eberts, Adam P, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: April 15, 2024Ruling
Date: February 29, 2024Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 27, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: September 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 13, 2023Ruling
Date: February 21, 2024DURAN_REQUEST_FOR_DISMISSAL_
Date: April 05, 2024DURAN_SETTLEMENT_OF_ENTIRE_CASE
Date: February 28, 2024JAIMES_DURAN_CRISTINA_LI_VIL_CASE_COVER_SHEET
Date: September 08, 2022JAIMES_DURAN_CRISTINA_LIT_PLD_SUMMONS
Date: September 08, 2022DURAN_CRISTINA_COMP_W_CAUSE_OF_ACTION
Date: September 08, 2022DURAN_CRISTINA_FEE_WAIVER
Date: September 08, 2022DURAN_CRISTINA_LIT_CF_POS_AUDREY_FOULKES_
Date: December 22, 202270450Answe00ebba
Date: February 06, 202370450Notic015700
Date: February 06, 2023DURAN_CRISTINA_LIT_CF_CMC_STATEMENT
Date: March 08, 202384725Notic00bf4d
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 02/29/2024 Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385 |
|
April 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1385 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
April 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | DURAN_REQUEST_FOR_DISMISSAL_ | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E 5 DAYS |
|
April 02, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5 DAYS Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT SET 4/2/24 |
|
March 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT SET 4/2/24 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 4/2/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 5 Days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.