Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jayden Gonzales, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Daniel Andrew Chavez, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2022 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 14, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 10, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 02, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: May 16, 2023Order to Appear
Date: May 16, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 14, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 16, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 08, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: September 06, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 02, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 17, 2024Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: May 16, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 27, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 09, 2023RFD JGonzales F01172024
Date: January 17, 2024unendorsed summons - 8.31.22 - gonzales
Date: August 31, 2022Certificate of Progress - 12.13.22 - Gonzales J
Date: December 13, 2022COP JGonzalez 11.08.2023
Date: November 09, 2023COP JGonzalez 11.08.2023
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 02/27/23, 5/16/23, 08/14/23 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
January 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 12/14/22, 02/27/23, 5/16/23, 08/14/23 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 02/27/23, 5/16/23, 08/14/23 |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 Cont'd from 12/14/22, 02/27/23, 5/16/23, 08/14/23 |
|
January 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice, complaint entire action |
|
January 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice Re: Request for Dismissal, form needs correction, please review item 2, a fee waiver was not granted in this case. |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice Electronic Rejection Notice Re: Request for Dismissal, form needs correction, please review item 2, a fee waiver was not granted in this case. |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice, complaint entire action |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | RFD JGonzales F01172024 | |
November 14, 2023 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference Cont'd from 02/27/23, 5/16/23, 08/14/23 Judge: Zulfa, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.