Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Andrea Flores, Arrezola, Clariza, Arrezola, Jose L., Bassey, Jeff, Boyles, Benjamin, (total of 36) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Chodzko, Megan, against Bakersfield 100, Lp., A California Limited Partnership, Mhp Builders, Inc., represented by Patel, Rupa, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2022 |
Category10-Cv Construction Defect - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
This complaint is filed by multiple plaintiffs against Bakersfield 100, LP and other defendants. The plaintiffs allege three causes of action: violation of building standards as set forth in California Civil Code Section 896, breach of contract, and ...
Case Management Conference
Date: January 17, 2023Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: April 30, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 02, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: October 31, 2022Ruling
Date: January 29, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 30, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: August 16, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: July 18, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 14, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 13, 2023Ärrezola. Declaration for 4-30-24 OSC (00519654x9C748)
Date: April 16, 2024Arrezola. CMS for 4-30-24 (00519655x9C748)
Date: April 16, 20246238 Arrezola - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 15, 20226238 Arrezola - Complaint
Date: July 15, 20226238 Arrezola - Summons
Date: July 15, 2022SF34022818
Date: November 29, 20236238 Arrezola - Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees
Date: August 29, 20226238 Arrezola - First Amendment
Date: August 29, 20226238 Arrezola - Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees
Date: August 30, 20226238 Arrezola - First Amendment
Date: September 01, 20226238 Arrezola - First Amendment
Date: September 02, 20226238 Arrezola - RFD for Maynard
Date: September 07, 202220220914185023726
Date: September 14, 20226238 Arrezola - RFD for Conley &Boyles
Date: November 04, 2022Def. Answer to Plaintiff Cross Complaint
Date: November 22, 2022Defendent Cross Complaint
Date: November 22, 2022Summons
Date: November 22, 2022POS 11.21 Arrezola
Date: November 22, 2022SF34008019
Date: December 09, 2022Arrezola. CM Statement (00490079x9C748)
Date: December 29, 2022SF34008556
Date: December 30, 2022SF34008925
Date: January 10, 202369379Stipu0011de
Date: January 17, 20236238 Arrezola - Notice of Continued CMC
Date: January 18, 20236238 Arrezola - RFD for Simoneschi
Date: March 08, 2023Arrezola. CM Statement for 8-16-23 CMC (00504179x9C748)
Date: July 28, 2023SF34017574
Date: July 31, 20236238 Arrezola - RFD for Wesson
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/29/2024- re: notice of settlement & OSC re dismissal as to plaintiff's complaint, only Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1382 as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 07/15/2022, ONLY |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 01/17/23, 04/18/23, 08/16/23, 12/14/23, 02/08/24 |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement - plaintiffs |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration of Megan M. Chodzko, Esq. in Support of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Ärrezola. Declaration for 4-30-24 OSC (00519654x9C748) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Arrezola. CMS for 4-30-24 (00519655x9C748) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/29/2024- re: notice of settlement & OSC re dismissal as to plaintiff's complaint, only Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 01/17/23, 04/18/23, 08/16/23, 12/14/23 |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling 01/29/2024- re: notice of settlement & OSC re dismissal as to plaintiff's complaint, only Ruling re: Notice of Settlement and OSC in re: Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 07/15/2022, ONLY |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement - Conditional as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed 07/15/2022, ONLY |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.