Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Security National Insurance Company, filed a(n) case against Advanced Panel Systems Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
CS
Date: July 15, 2022Summons
Date: July 15, 2022POS
Date: August 04, 2022Request for Entry of Default
Date: September 07, 2022Request for Clerk's Default
Date: September 09, 2022DecJudgment
Date: September 09, 2022Judgment
Date: September 09, 2022RFD DOES
Date: September 09, 2022Request for Court's Default
Date: September 15, 2022Judgment
Date: September 15, 2022ClientDecCourtJudgment
Date: September 15, 2022Complaint
Date: July 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Court's Default | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ClientDecCourtJudgment | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Clerk's Default | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DecJudgment | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RFD DOES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | POS | |
July 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.