Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ajooni Chauhan, Guadalupe Eloisa Hernandez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Noe Silva-Diaz, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Zulfa, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZulfa, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Third Amended Order Approving
Date: March 20, 2024Second Amended Order to Deposit
Date: March 20, 2024Amended Order to Deposit
Date: March 04, 2024Second Amended Order Approving Compromise
Date: March 04, 2024Amended Order Approving Compromise
Date: February 21, 2024Hernandez Guadalupe. COP
Date: February 15, 2024Hernandez Guadalupe. COP
Date: January 16, 2024summons
Date: July 14, 2022Hernandez.civil case cover
Date: July 14, 2022Hernandez.Guadalupe.complaint
Date: July 14, 2022Application for Ajooni Chauhan
Date: July 14, 2022Application for Noor Chauhan
Date: July 14, 2022Hernandez Stip to Correct FAC
Date: January 03, 2024Hernandez POS
Date: August 04, 2022Hernandez. First.Amended.Complaint
Date: September 14, 2022Hernandez.summons.amendment.
Date: September 14, 2022Hernandez.Guadalupe.Deposit.Jury.fees
Date: December 28, 2022Hernandez.Guadalup.CMC.statement.
Date: December 28, 2022Hernandez.COP
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Third Amended Order Approving | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Second Amended Order to Deposit | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Order to Deposit | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Second Amended Order Approving Compromise | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Order Approving Compromise | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Hernandez Guadalupe. COP | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Expedited Petition for Approval of Compromise | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Correct the First Amended Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.