Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Buena Vista Water Storage District, A California Water Storage District, City Of Bakersfield, A Charte City And California Municipal Corporation, Kern County Water Agency, Kern Delta Water District, North Kern Water Storage District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) case against Rosedale-Rio Bravo Water Storage District, A California Water Storage District, Rosedale-Rio Bravo Water Storage District, Its Board Of Directors, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJune 27, 2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
POS (includes Summons)
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 26, 202220220726 Notice of Related Case Kern Delta
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE TO RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES
Date: July 27, 202220220728 Notice of Related Case Kern Delta
Date: July 28, 202220220728 Ntc of MSC (Onyx Ranch Litigation)
Date: July 28, 202220220729_FINAL Stip to Partial Consolidation (Onyx)
Date: July 29, 20222022-08-09 City of Bakersfield POS Re Notice to Responsible Agencies -
Date: August 09, 202220220812 FINAL Ntc of Entry of Order of Stip
Date: August 12, 2022Req for hearing
Date: August 16, 2022BV's Request for CEQA Hearing
Date: August 17, 202220220831FINAL Stip re Admin Record (Onyx Ranch Litigation)
Date: August 31, 202220221103 FINAL Stip re Admin Record (Onyx Ranch Litigation)
Date: November 03, 2022FINAL Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 04, 2022Petitioners Motion for Change of Venue
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Continued Hearing
Date: December 07, 202200659190
Date: December 27, 202220221229 FINAL Stip to Extemd AR Record
Date: December 30, 202220221230 FINAL Notice of Related Case
Date: December 30, 2022FINAL Notice of Entry of Order to extend Admin Record
Date: January 06, 202320230120 FINAL Proposed Order
Date: January 20, 202320230120 FINAL Stand Alone Proof of Service
Date: January 20, 202320230120 FINAL Notice of Non Opp
Date: January 20, 202320230125 FINAL_Stip re Venue (CEQA Actions - Onyx)
Date: January 26, 202320230125 POS of Stip re Venue
Date: January 26, 2023FINAL 20230202 DNR Decl re SCSC location -101616
Date: February 02, 202320230202 FINAL Notice of Entry of Order of Stip to Change venue
Date: February 02, 2023POS re Notice to Atty General
Date: July 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL 20230202 DNR Decl re SCSC location -101616 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230202 FINAL Notice of Entry of Order of Stip to Change venue | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230125 FINAL_Stip re Venue (CEQA Actions - Onyx) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230125 POS of Stip re Venue | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230120 FINAL Proposed Order | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230120 FINAL Stand Alone Proof of Service | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | 20230120 FINAL Notice of Non Opp | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL Notice of Entry of Order to extend Admin Record | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 20221229 FINAL Stip to Extemd AR Record | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 20221230 FINAL Notice of Related Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.