Case Last Refreshed: 24 minutes ago
Kern County Public Administrator, As Administrator Of The Estate Of Donald Hillhouse, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Dessy, Fawn Kennedy, Dessy, Ronald D, against All Other Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In This Complaint, Which Is Adverse To Plaintiffs Title Or Creating Any Cloud On Plaintiffs Title, And All Persons Otherwise Unknown Claiming Any Interest In The Property, Named, Estate Of Daniel Gilbert Tarr, Gilbert Tarr The Testate And Intestate Successors Of Gilbert Tarr, Deceased, And All Persons Claiming By, Through, Or Under Said Decedent, Kern County Fire Department, Lucia M. Perez By And Through Her Attorney Michael R. Young, (total of 9) See All represented by Brumfield, Robert H, Lubin, Lee D, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
Category26-Cv Other Real Property-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Kern County Superior Court of California. The plaintiff, Kern County Public Administrator, is seeking partition of real property and an accounting. The defendants named in the complaint include Gilbert ...
All Other Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In This Complaint, Which Is Adverse To Plaintiffs Title Or Creating Any Cloud On Plaintiffs Title, And All Persons Otherwise Unknown Claiming Any Interest In The Property, Named
Gilbert Tarr The Testate And Intestate Successors Of Gilbert Tarr, Deceased, And All Persons Claiming By, Through, Or Under Said Decedent
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: November 14, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 10, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 07, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 01, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: October 26, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 03, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: April 26, 2024Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: December 29, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 10, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 09, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 29, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 24, 2024Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: June 08, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 28, 2022Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: June 15, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2022Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 15, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 26, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 12, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 07, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 04, 2023NOE KCSC Hillhouse v Tarr
Date: May 02, 2024NOS KCPA Hillhouse v Tarr
Date: April 25, 2024Stipulation and Order KCPA Hillhouse v Tarr
Date: April 25, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 29, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 29, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 16, 2024Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: August 15, 2023DOC077
Date: April 25, 2024Answer - Tarr
Date: February 13, 2024Answer to Complaint
Date: April 22, 2024POS of Summons Est of Daniel Gilbert Tarr re KCPA HH v EDGT
Date: January 24, 2024CCCS KCPA Estate of D Hillhouse vs Tarr et al
Date: February 23, 2022Summons KCPA Estate of D Hillhouse vs Tarr et al
Date: February 23, 2022Complaint Estate of Hillhouse v Tarr et al
Date: February 23, 2022ExParte App for Order for Pub of Summons KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 2022Order for Publication of Summons KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 2022POS of Summons re KCFD KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 2022POS of Summons re TTCCK KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 2022POS of Summons re Tarr KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 2022POS of Summons re Lucia M Perez KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 11, 202255475Defen006c21
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Entry of Default on L M Perez KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: April 05, 2022Filing of recorded copy of Lis Pendens KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: April 08, 2022POS of Summons KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: May 03, 2022RFED re Tarr KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: May 11, 2022POS POP ON all persons etc KCPA HH v TTISGTarr
Date: December 27, 2023POS POP on The testate and intestate successors of Gilbert Tarr deceased KCPA HH v TTISGTarr
Date: December 27, 2023121523POS by Mail KCPA HH v TTISGT
Date: December 15, 2023Amendment to Amended Supplemental Complaint and Order Thereon KCPA HH v TTIS GT
Date: December 15, 2023posting Proof of Service - KCPA HH v ttis of Tarr (1)
Date: December 07, 2023CM St KCPA DH v Tarr
Date: August 04, 2022Order for Publication of Summons KPPAHH v TTIS
Date: November 18, 2023Exparte Applic for Order for Publication KCPAHH v The testate and intestate
Date: November 18, 2023Request for Partial Dismissal KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: November 18, 2023Notice of CMC KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: October 27, 2022Stipulation to Set Aside Default
Date: October 31, 2022Answer of Gilbert Tarr
Date: January 03, 2023CM st KCPA HH v Tarr 1-17-23
Date: January 17, 2023CMC Statement - Gilbert Tarr
Date: January 22, 2023Notice of FCMC KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: February 03, 2023Answer of Gilbert Tarr (2-10-22)
Date: February 10, 2023Sub Attorney (Gilbert Tarr)(rescan)
Date: February 11, 2023Dec of Lee Lubin re Sub Attorney
Date: March 13, 2023Application and Order Allowing Amendment to Complaint ... KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: March 21, 2023Dec of Lee Lubin in response to OSC on 8-15-23
Date: July 18, 2023Order on PMEIJ and OSCIS KCPA HH v Tarr
Date: August 28, 2023Amended Supplemental Complaint KCPA HH v Tarr et al
Date: October 19, 2023Summons ASC KPCAHH v The testate and intestate successors of Tarr et al
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E: 2 DAYS Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial T/E: 2 DAYS |
|
May 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Friedman - Retired, Gary T. |
|
May 02, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Plaintiff's Stipulation and Order for Entry of Partition Judgment Signed 4/30/2024 |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Plaintiff's Stipulation and Order for Entry of Partition Judgment Signed 4/30/2024 |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOE KCSC Hillhouse v Tarr | |
April 30, 2024 | Hearing |
Judgment - Partition Stipulation and Order for Entry of Partition Judgment Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Partition Stipulation and Order for Entry of Partition Judgment |
|
April 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Court Trial set for 5/28/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 2 Days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.