Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Leili Argueta, Rosa Rivas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edmonston, Craig A, against Gerald Weimer, Pamela Weimer, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
doc08466320220127161702
Date: January 29, 2022doc08475320220128161511
Date: January 29, 2022doc08466120220127161121
Date: January 29, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 01, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: May 17, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 01, 2022doc08571220220217095013
Date: February 17, 2022doc08735920220325112318
Date: March 25, 2022Demurrer w POS
Date: April 07, 2022Rivas First Amended Complaint
Date: April 21, 2022Notice of Taking Demurrer Off-Cal w POS
Date: April 27, 2022Def Answer to 1st Amended Complaint w POS
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: May 18, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 18, 2022CMC STATEMENT - 08.01.22
Date: June 14, 2022Rivas CMC 8-1
Date: July 19, 2022doc09275120220719154737
Date: July 19, 2022MTC - RFP#1 - Rosa Rivas
Date: November 12, 2022MTC - SROGS#1 - Rosa Rivas
Date: November 12, 2022Notice of Taking MTC Off-Cal
Date: November 23, 2022Amendment to Complaint
Date: February 10, 2023Answer to Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 13, 2023doc10857820230628103420
Date: June 28, 2023Rivas Order Approving
Date: June 28, 2023Order to Deposit
Date: June 28, 2023doc10938820230724163657
Date: July 24, 2023doc11355620231031090129
Date: October 31, 2023Exec Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Exec Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | doc11355620231031090129 | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | doc10938820230724163657 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | doc10857820230628103420 | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Rivas Order Approving | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Amendment to Complaint | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking MTC Off-Cal | |
November 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MTC - RFP#1 - Rosa Rivas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.