Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanchez, Christina, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Brill, Thomas A, against Walmart, Walmart, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBradshaw, J. Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order to Show Cause
Date: November 08, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: February 22, 2022WALMART INC.'s Answer (010622)(SANwal)
Date: January 07, 2022Walmart CMC Statement (041922)(SANwal)
Date: April 19, 2022Walmart Amnd CMC Statement (041922)(SANwal)
Date: April 20, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT- C SANCHEZ
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES
Date: April 25, 2022Walmart Post Jury Fees (050922)(SANwal)
Date: May 09, 2022Dec to Stip and Order to Cont Trial
Date: February 17, 2023Stip and Order to Cont trial date
Date: February 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Dec to Stip and Order to Cont Trial | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and Order to Cont trial date | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mark T. Lobre in Support of Stipulation to Vacate and Reset Mandatory Settlement Conference Date, Trial Date and Related...(show more)of Mark T. Lobre in Support of Stipulation to Vacate and Reset Mandatory Settlement Conference Date, Trial Date and Related Deadlines |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Walmart Post Jury Fees (050922)(SANwal) | |
May 09, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury fees to be posted pursuant to CCP 631 by Failure to post will result in an automatic waiver of jury trial.Failure to post will result in an automatic waiver of jury trial. |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT- C SANCHEZ | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.