Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Borgna, Mariah, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Madjidi, Mahru, against Compass Senior Living, Llc, Farillas, Benny, Monroe, Kala, Summit Hills 85, Llc, Vasindas' Around The Clock Care, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2021 |
Category36-Cv Wrongful Termination - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Order to Show Cause
Date: October 05, 202152278ANSWE00bf38
Date: January 20, 2022NTC OF COA (BORGNA)
Date: February 14, 2022NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES (BORGNA)
Date: February 14, 2022NTC OF COA (BORGNA)
Date: February 15, 2022CMS (BORGNA)
Date: February 16, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT.(BORGNA).FINAL
Date: February 23, 2022NTC OF SETTLEMENT (BORGNA)
Date: April 04, 2022REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (BORGNA)
Date: April 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (BORGNA) | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC OF SETTLEMENT (BORGNA) | |
April 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT.(BORGNA).FINAL | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CMS (BORGNA) | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC OF COA (BORGNA) | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC OF COA (BORGNA) | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NTC OF POSTING JURY FEES (BORGNA) | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 52278ANSWE00bf38 | |
January 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.