Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
County Of Kern, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jenkins, Phillip T., against Edwards, William, Jr., Hti Brands, A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: September 07, 202153245Reque00456f
Date: February 09, 202253506Reque0052c6
Date: February 16, 202253558Notic00ac69
Date: February 16, 202253930CaseM003614
Date: February 24, 202256978Reque00bc76
Date: April 29, 202259470CaseM00e4fb
Date: June 23, 202259920Reque0088c5
Date: July 05, 202260203Reque00e599
Date: July 11, 202260370Reque00b3f6
Date: July 14, 202260541Exhib01e24c
Date: July 18, 202260541Reque006353
Date: July 18, 202287481Notic008cd4
Date: November 29, 202360769Exhib01625a
Date: July 22, 202261118Reque003e11
Date: July 29, 202261118Judgm01c4b9
Date: July 29, 202264460Reque004cd7
Date: October 05, 202264460Decla013e21
Date: October 05, 202264460Judgm027375
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | 87481Notic008cd4 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 64460Reque004cd7 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 64460Decla013e21 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 64460Judgm027375 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | 61118Reque003e11 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | 61118Judgm01c4b9 | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | 60769Exhib01625a | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 60541Exhib01e24c | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | 60541Reque006353 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 60370Reque00b3f6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.