Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pablo C. Cervantes, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Quigg, Vincent J, against Irma Montemayor, Santos Montemayor, Vista Verde Vineyards Llc, Vista Verde Vineyards, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Martinez, Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 26, 2021POS_Irma_Montemayor_BCV_21_101959
Date: January 18, 2022POS_Vista_Verde_Vineyards_LLC_BCV_21_101959
Date: January 18, 2022POS_Santos_Montemayor_BCV_21_101959
Date: January 18, 2022POS_Summons_Vista_Verde___rd_LLC_BCV_21_101959
Date: January 21, 2022CMC Statement
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 31, 2022Case_Management_Statement_BCV_21_101959
Date: February 22, 2022Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: January 07, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 19, 2022Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 07, 2022Order to Appear
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 23, 2022CMC Statement
Date: March 09, 2022Request_for_Reconsideration_BCV_21_101959
Date: March 22, 2022CMC_Statement_BCV_21_101959
Date: March 22, 2022Stip to Cont Trial
Date: January 04, 2023Cervantes v Vista Verde-Stip toContinue Trial
Date: January 19, 2023Cervantes v Vista Verde - Stip to Continue Trial filed 1.19.23
Date: January 19, 2023doc00945220230721104335
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | doc00945220230721104335 | |
July 21, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Dismissal filed 05/23/2023 |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Not Entered - Dismissal filed 05/23/2023 |
|
June 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) with prejudice as to the entire action |
|
April 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Ruling re: Notice of Settlement filed, and OSC in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 |
|
April 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) re: Imposition of Sanctions in the amount of $250.00 as to plaintiff and defense counsel, Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
April 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Trial Setting Conference ** per 1/25/2023 Ruling ** cont'd from 02/21/23 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.