Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
De Crescenzo, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Faulkner, Matthew J, against Lyft, Inc., Sekhon, Jaspreet Singh, represented by Dahm, Stephen L, Juschin, Madison, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 20, 2021Notice
Date: January 14, 202252721Defen0071d1
Date: January 28, 202252721CaseM01203f
Date: January 28, 2022Plaintiff Case Management Statement - Decrescenzo
Date: February 09, 2022Plaintiff Notice Posting Jury Fees- Decrescenzo
Date: February 09, 2022JURY FEES
Date: February 10, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 28, 2021Motion to Set Aside (Pre-Disposition)
Date: December 28, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 10, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 29, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 20, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 29, 2021PostJuryFees
Date: October 11, 202265379STIPU006cdf
Date: October 24, 202265379PROPO015018
Date: October 24, 202266001PROPO00e0d5
Date: November 04, 202266340STIPU006825
Date: November 14, 202266340PROPO016062
Date: November 14, 202284992Propo02e3ce
Date: October 19, 202384992Decla01133b
Date: October 19, 202384992ExPar008be3
Date: October 19, 2023Decl2 To Continue Trial
Date: October 25, 2023Order2 To Continue Trial
Date: October 25, 2023EPA2 To Continue Trial
Date: October 25, 2023Stip2 To Continue Trial
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2025 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5-7 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 31, 2025 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 02/03/25 T/E 5-7 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E 5 days. Jury for both Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
December 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT = 12/11/23 T/E 5 days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
November 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference FCMC: 12/08/2023 // JT: 12/11/2023 // T/E: 5 DAYS (D-H) Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Discovery Deadlines Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Use Only - Pre-Cleared Ex Parte 10/24/23 due 10/26/23 by noon; Def: Sekhon's Ex Parte App to Continue Trial and Related Dates; Stephen Dahm, Esq. - 650-991-5126 ext 12 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Decl2 To Continue Trial | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order2 To Continue Trial | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | EPA2 To Continue Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.