Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Delta Trucking Co Inc, Z Brothers Express Inc, Zubarev, Sergey, Nunez, Gabriel Garcia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clark, Matthew C, Cohn, David K, against Delta Trucking Co Inc, Delta Trucking Go, Inc., Z Brothers Express, Inc., Zubarev, Sergey, represented by Rossmiller, Anthony R, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
Category22-Cv Auto - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2022Ruling
Date: January 18, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 20, 2023Order to Show Cause
Date: August 12, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: February 21, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 01, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 25, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: June 01, 2022Motion to Consolidate
Date: January 30, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 04, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 17, 2023Motion to Continue
Date: February 21, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 14, 2022Ruling
Date: January 29, 2024Further Case Management Conference
Date: March 03, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 01, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 10, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 01, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 26, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: January 19, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 08, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 17, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 01, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 04, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: November 16, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 25, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: September 01, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 19, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 24, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 13, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 17, 2023Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: November 29, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 27, 202393725Reque00a958
Date: March 12, 2024COP Nunez
Date: February 28, 2024Substitution of Attorney - Nunez.Vieira v Z Brothers Express Inc (final)
Date: February 16, 202492236Settl003c30
Date: February 19, 2024ntc of assoc
Date: February 09, 202490672PROPO01a720
Date: January 24, 202490672MOTIO004a90
Date: January 24, 2024Ntc Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 21, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: January 21, 202252423CaseM00a5d8
Date: January 24, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: May 11, 202257682CaseM00a5c9
Date: May 16, 2022Nunez.Gabriel NameChange
Date: June 29, 2022SUMMONS
Date: December 07, 202361553CaseM00c95d
Date: August 05, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: August 16, 202262940Notic000edf
Date: September 02, 202286914Answe002ddc
Date: November 17, 2023CMC Stmt
Date: October 26, 202265783CaseM00a7f1
Date: November 01, 202268433Memor014412
Date: December 28, 202268433Decla022992
Date: December 28, 202268433Proof03da29
Date: December 28, 202268433Motio009c02
Date: December 28, 2022CMC Stmt
Date: December 29, 202268660CaseM008c2f
Date: January 03, 202368925CaseM00df76
Date: January 09, 202370120PROPO00aa47
Date: January 31, 202371069CaseM002d73
Date: February 17, 202371121CaseM00588d
Date: February 17, 20232023-2-21 P cmc stmt for 3-3-23
Date: February 21, 202372317Notic00fa1a
Date: March 13, 2023Proof_2
Date: July 18, 2023AmndAnswerNunezvZBros
Date: September 19, 2023CrossComplaintNunezvZBrosExpress
Date: September 19, 2023AmndSummons
Date: September 19, 2023x comp
Date: October 25, 2023somm cross
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) |
|
March 28, 2025 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 04/01/25 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) |
|
February 28, 2025 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385, as to Complaint in lead case BCV-21-101863 ONLY |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) |
|
March 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 03/18/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) |
|
March 15, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 03/18/24 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES (CONFIRM PLTFF JOSE PACHECO VIERA POSTED J/F) Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385, as to Complaint in lead case BCV-21-101863 ONLY |
|
March 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385, as to Complaint in lead case BCV-21-101863 ONLY Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.