Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
John Hardin, Individually, And On Behalf Of Other Members Of The General Public Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aiwazian, Edwin, against Platt Electric Supply, An Unknow Business Entity, Platt Electric Supply, Inc., An Unknown Business Entity, Rexel Inc., An Unknown Business Entity, Rexel Usa, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Order to Show Cause
Date: August 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
November 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/19/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
August 06, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
August 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/19/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
August 06, 2021 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
August 05, 2021 | Hearing | Complaint | |
August 05, 2021 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.