Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Greeley, Mark, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rose, Adam, against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Compas Auto Sales, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice as to Proof of Service : The Attorneys Information at the top of the page is illegible . Please review. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Electronic Rejection Notice as to Proof of Service : The Attorneys Information at the top of the page is illegible . Please review. |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/27/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 10 |
|
June 14, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
June 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/27/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division: 10 |
|
June 14, 2021 | Hearing |
Declaration Re: Venue |
|
June 14, 2021 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
June 14, 2021 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.