Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Brenda L Singer On Behalf Of All Other Similarly Situated And Aggrieved, Brenda L. Singer On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, Singer, Brenda L., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bibiyan, David D, against Desert Area Resources And Training, Desert Resources And Training, A California Corporation, represented by Wang, Evelyn F, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Ruling
Date: October 20, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 15, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 31, 2021Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: November 14, 2022Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: April 14, 2023Further Case Management Conference
Date: September 20, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 23, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 17, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: June 21, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 18, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 06, 202295762DECLA001273
Date: April 11, 202493532Notic0030ca
Date: March 08, 2024STIP
Date: February 17, 2022DART Joint Status Report
Date: March 08, 202255836JOINT008c66
Date: April 06, 202255948FIRST0073df
Date: April 08, 2022Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint
Date: May 09, 2022STATUS
Date: June 16, 2022Joint Status Report 9.20.22
Date: September 14, 202268042 CMC
Date: September 21, 202266463PROPO00967a
Date: November 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference RE: STATUS OF DISTRIBUTION Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference 09/20/2022 Case Management Conference RE: STATUS OF DISTRIBUTION |
|
April 11, 2024 | Hearing | DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA POLITES OF ILYM GROUP, INC., REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS (Declarations) | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CASSANDRA POLITES OF ILYM GROUP, INC., REGARDING DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS (Declarations) | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 95762DECLA001273 | |
March 08, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Change Name/Address | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | 93532Notic0030ca | |
April 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Judgment PURSUANT TO ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLMENT Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 17, 2023 | Hearing |
Order Granting Motion FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment PURSUANT TO ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION SETTLMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.