Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tcf National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Horowitt, Darryl J, against Dhaliwal, Jaswinder S., K M Xpress Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarmann, Bernard C., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: March 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: April 16, 2021Application (Pre-Disposition)
Date: April 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/27/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 09/27/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 27, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
September 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Statement Hrg: 9/27/21 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 10 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Hrg: 9/27/21 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 10 |
|
August 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Writ of Possession Issued Writ of Possession |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued Writ of Possession |
|
August 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Miscellaneous Filing Writ of Possession-Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.