Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Irene Middleton, Middleton, Irene, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Geoulla, Daniel D, against Hodel, Robert D., Hodel'S Country Dining, Hodel'S Development Corporation, Robert D. Hodel, represented by Hall, Ann C, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2021 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 08, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: December 09, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 09, 2021Stipulation to Continue Triall - signed
Date: June 21, 2022MTN Compel IME
Date: July 16, 2022Proposed order - MTN Compel IME_071522-202456.docx
Date: July 16, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: August 11, 2022P Opp to D MTC DME
Date: September 07, 2022PRINT Reply - MTN COMPEL IME
Date: September 10, 2022PROPOSED ORDER -IN RE MTC DME
Date: October 21, 2022CM-200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT signed 2
Date: February 21, 2023CIV-110 Request for Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIV-110 Request for Dismissal | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CM-200 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT signed 2 | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER -IN RE MTC DME | |
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
October 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
September 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PRINT Reply - MTN COMPEL IME | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | P Opp to D MTC DME | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name | |
July 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MTN Compel IME | |
July 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed order - MTN Compel IME_071522-202456 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.