Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Dominguez, Jose, Jose Dominguez On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lapuyade, Jean-Claude, Zakay, Shani O, against Basin Valve Company, Blair-Martin Co., Inc., represented by Arias, Ronald J, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: June 13, 2022Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: May 25, 2022Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)
Date: June 13, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 13, 2022Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: May 03, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 25, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: July 12, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 13, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: April 27, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: June 25, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: January 12, 2021Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 25, 2022Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)
Date: May 25, 20222022_05_02_SOZ Dec.
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_JD Dec.
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_ILYM Dec.
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_Proposed Order.docx
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_POS - FA
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_Notice of Motion
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_POS - Fees
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_JCL Dec.
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_02_P&A
Date: May 03, 20222022_05_04_Amended Notice of Motion
Date: May 04, 20222022_05_04_POS - Amended NOM
Date: May 04, 20222022_06_08_[ZLG]POS
Date: June 08, 20222022_06_08_Supp. JCL Dec.
Date: June 08, 20222022_06_08_REVISED [Proposed] FA Order.docx
Date: June 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 06/13/2022 Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement set by the court on 01/25/2022, Cont'd from 05/25/22 |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Final Approval and Judgment |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 06/13/2022 Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) PL- Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Service Award Filed 5/2 Amended Notice filed 5/4/2022 Cont'd from 05/25/22 |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 06/13/2022 Case Management Conference Cont'd from 07/12/21 10/14/21 - reset by court on 01/25/2022, 05/25/22 |
|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Order Granting Final Approval and Judgment Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement set by the court on 01/25/2022, Cont'd from 05/25/22 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) PL- Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Service Award Filed 5/2 Amended Notice filed 5/4/2022 Cont'd from 05/25/22 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Cont'd from 07/12/21 10/14/21 - reset by court on 01/25/2022, 05/25/22 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Final Approval and JudgmentGranting Final Approval and Judgment |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Supplemental Declaration and Amended Proposed Order on June 13th Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.