Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arturo Avila, Arturo Avila On Behalf Of The Putative Class, Daniel Ojeda, Marie Barraza Vae, Marie Barraza Vae On Behalf Of Herself And On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Dychter, Alexander I., against Moga Transport, Inc, represented by Anderies, Shane K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: December 30, 2020LA238082.3488201.12_FINAL Avila Proposed Order Granting MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488202.13_FINAL MFA POS
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488192.6_MOGA - Decl of Dychter ISO Final Approval - 1.31.22
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488186.2_FINAL Avila MOPA iso MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488191.5_Sani Decl ISO MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488199.11_Ojeda Decl ISO MFA - signed
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488198.10_FINAL Avila Decl iso MFA (executed)
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488188.3_FINAL Yadidsion Decl iso Avila MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488194.8_Vae v MOGA Transport Notice DECL_FNL_For Counsel
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488185.1_FINAL Avila - Notice of MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488190.4_Haines Decl ISO MFA
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488193.7_MOGA - Decl of Katri ISO Final Approval - signed
Date: February 03, 2022LA238082.3488197.9_Bridley Decl v2
Date: February 03, 2022Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: November 18, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 09, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 09, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 17, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 20, 2021Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement
Date: February 25, 2022Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 25, 202272771Stipu00b7e4
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition Non-appearance compliance hearing re: final approval on class action settlement Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition Non-appearance compliance hearing re: final approval on class action settlement Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 72771Stipu00b7e4 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference/Final Approval Hearing 02/25/2022 Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 2/3/22 Plaintiff, ARTURO AVILA Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference/Final Approval Hearing 02/25/2022 Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 10/05/21, 11/18/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
February 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Further Case Management Conference cont'd from 10/05/21, 11/18/21 Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Approval Hearing on Class Action Settlement 2/3/22 Plaintiff, ARTURO AVILA Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LA238082.3488201.12_FINAL Avila Proposed Order Granting MFA | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LA238082.3488202.13_FINAL MFA POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.