Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Santa Clarita Concrete, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Flores, Aaron J., against Las Virgenes Unified School District, A California Unified School District, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, A Massachusetts Corporation, S.C. Anderson Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lampe, David R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order to Show Cause
Date: November 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
March 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/03/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
November 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 03/03/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11 |
|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 17, 2020 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
November 17, 2020 | Hearing | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.