Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Altamirano, Celerino, Altamirano-Davila, Alex, Altamirano-Davila, Gabriela, Altamirano, Eva Angeles, Altamirano, Juan Carlos, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bennett, Richard C, against Best Way Freight Inc., Esparza, Filiberto, represented by Snyder, Barry Clifford, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2020 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Alex Petition With Proof
Date: January 07, 2022Gabriela Petition With Proof
Date: January 07, 2022Juan Petition With Proof
Date: January 07, 2022Order to Deposit Money Gabriel
Date: January 11, 2022Order to Deposit Money Juan
Date: January 11, 2022Order Approving Compromise Gabriela
Date: January 11, 2022Order Approving Compromise Alex
Date: January 11, 2022Order to Deposit Money Alex
Date: January 11, 2022Order Approving Compromise Juan
Date: January 11, 2022Gabriela Petition with Proof
Date: January 11, 2022Alex Petition with Proof
Date: January 11, 2022Juan Petition With Proof
Date: January 11, 2022Supplemental Declaration signed
Date: February 01, 2022Order Approving Compromise Gabriela
Date: February 01, 2022Order to Deposit Funds Alex
Date: February 01, 2022Order to Deposit Funds Juan
Date: February 01, 2022Order Approving Compromise Juan
Date: February 01, 2022Order to Deposit Funds Gabriela
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: March 24, 2022ReqDismiss
Date: April 14, 2022NtcEntryDsmsl&POS
Date: April 15, 2022Order Approving Compromise Alex
Date: February 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NtcEntryDsmsl&POS | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ReqDismiss | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 8 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Supplemental Declaration signed | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise Gabriela | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Funds Alex | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Deposit Funds Juan | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Approving Compromise Juan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.