Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Hernandez, Jose, Hernandez, Maria, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David N, against Nissan North America, Inc., represented by Rose, Melissa H., in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Bradshaw, J. Eric presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management207 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2020 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial717 days |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: August 06, 2020Ruling
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 20, 2020Ruling
Date: February 10, 2022Ruling
Date: February 08, 2022Ruling
Date: January 04, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: September 17, 2020Demurrer
Date: September 17, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: April 23, 2020Hernandez Maria et al v. NNA - NOS - Signed
Date: February 10, 2022Hernandez Maria et al v. NNA - RFD - Signed
Date: April 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Re: 3.1385 Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal Re: 3.1385 |
|
April 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Hernandez Maria et al v. NNA - RFD - Signed | |
April 22, 2022 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice as to Entire action of all parties and all causes of action |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) With prejudice as to Entire action of all parties and all causes of action |
|
March 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
March 14, 2022 | Hearing |
Court Trial T/E 3-5 DAYS Judge: Bradshaw, J. Eric |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial T/E 3-5 DAYS Judge: Lampe, David R. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference C/T & FSC SET 3/14/22 9AM (Div. J) T/E 3-5 DAYS Judge: Brehmer, Charles R. |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference C/T & FSC SET 3/14/22 9AM (Div. J) T/E 3-5 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.