Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Harold Crawford Co., Inc., James Welch As Personal Representative For The Estate Of Carmen J. Hadley, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniels, William A, against Harold Crawford Co., Inc., represented by Dodgin, Dustin S, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2020 |
Category06-Cv Breach Of Contract/Warranty-Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial522 days |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: December 14, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: February 23, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: April 27, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 17, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 10, 2021Motion for Leave
Date: December 10, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 10, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: December 16, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: August 16, 2022Jury Trial
Date: January 17, 2023Ruling
Date: October 27, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: October 22, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Voluntary Settlement Conference
Date: July 30, 2021Ruling
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: July 19, 2021Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: July 19, 2021Demurrer
Date: April 06, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 24, 2021Ruling
Date: December 28, 2020Ruling
Date: December 08, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 21, 2020Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition
Date: December 08, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: February 20, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 19, 2021Demurrer
Date: July 19, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 05, 2021Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: January 12, 2021Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: June 03, 20202022.01.07 Exhbts to 3rd Amnd Cplt
Date: January 07, 20222022.01.07 Ntc Errate P's 3rd Amd Cplt
Date: January 07, 2022Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint
Date: January 11, 20222022.01.24 P'S OPP TO MTN 2 STRIKE
Date: January 24, 2022HCC's Reply re MTS 3rd Am. Complaint
Date: February 16, 20222022.02.16 Ntc of Telephonic Appearance
Date: February 16, 2022HCC ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 20224.14.22 HCC's Case Management Statement {CM-110}
Date: April 14, 2022Order to Show Cause
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: December 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 08, 2020Order on Motion
Date: January 22, 2021Renotice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 22, 2021Opposition
Date: July 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 10, 2021Amended Answer
Date: August 11, 2021Certificate of Progress
Date: September 14, 2021Opposition
Date: January 24, 2022Declaration
Date: November 10, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: March 09, 2022Opposition
Date: November 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 29, 20212022.04.27 [PROPOSED] Order
Date: April 27, 20222022.04.274 P's DEC of WAD Jr.
Date: April 27, 20222022.04.27 P's Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 20222022.04.274 P's Ntc Mtn MSA
Date: April 27, 20222022.04.27 P's P&A MSA
Date: April 27, 20222022.05.16 P's Amended NTC of MSA
Date: May 17, 20222022.05.16 P's Amended DEC [COMPRESSED]
Date: May 17, 20222022.05.16 POS
Date: May 17, 2022HCC's Separately Bound Evidence in Opp of MSA
Date: August 03, 2022HCC's Separate Statement in Opp of MSA
Date: August 03, 2022HCC's Memo in Opp of MSA
Date: August 03, 20222022.08.11 Decl. of WADJR in Supp of MSA & Exh
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.11 P's Obj D's Evidence Reply to Opp
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.11 P's Memo of P&A Reply to Opp
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.11 P's Resp IFSO P's Sep Stmt to MSA
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.11 POS
Date: August 12, 20222022.08.19 Ntc of Ruling MSA
Date: August 19, 20222022.08.23 Correspondence to The Court
Date: August 23, 20222022.09.27 Memorandum P&A
Date: September 27, 20222022.09.27 Separate Statement
Date: September 27, 20222022.09.27 Ntc of Renewed Mtn & Mtn
Date: September 27, 20222022.09.27 Proposed Order
Date: September 27, 20222022.09.27 Decl. of WADJR (Compressed)
Date: September 27, 20222022.09.27 POS
Date: September 27, 2022HCC KDG Address Change
Date: October 07, 2022OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY w-Proof
Date: November 21, 2022FINAL SBE ISO Opp to Renewed MSA with Exhibits_cmp
Date: December 02, 2022FINAL Opposition Memo to Renewed MSA
Date: December 02, 2022FINAL Separate Statement ISO Opp to Renewed MSA
Date: December 02, 20222022.12.06 Decl of WADJr
Date: December 07, 20222022.12.06 POS
Date: December 07, 20222022.12.06 Plf Memo P-A
Date: December 07, 20222022.12.06 Plf Reply
Date: December 07, 20222022.12.06 Plf Objection
Date: December 07, 20222023.01.10 Req Jud Ntc
Date: January 11, 20232023.01.17 Ntc Continued Trial
Date: January 17, 2023Complaint
Date: February 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)
Date: February 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial estimate 3 days |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
June 17, 2024 | Hearing |
Court Trial estimate 3 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Hearing |
Court Trial estimate 3 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial estimate 3 days |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ruling 10/27/2023 Ruling Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Trial | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 01/17/2023 Jury Trial Final CMC same date and time T/E 5 days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.