Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Sertic, Eric, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mohamadi, Ashkahn, against Garcia, Noe, Guido, Laura, represented by Lowtrip, Justin T, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management244 days |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
Category23-Cv Other Pi/Pd/Wd - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: July 01, 2024Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal
Date: March 29, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2023Case Status Conference
Date: July 27, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: April 28, 2022Ruling
Date: February 21, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 20, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: August 26, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 20, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 29, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2024Case Status Conference
Date: October 26, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: February 23, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 15, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 17, 2021Case Status Conference
Date: January 10, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 14, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 18, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: July 27, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 11, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 11, 2021Case Status Conference
Date: December 07, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 24, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: November 26, 2019Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110
Date: March 10, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 27, 2024Case Status Conference
Date: October 18, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 01, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 14, 2022Case Status Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Ruling
Date: February 13, 2024Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 28, 2020Case Status Conference
Date: June 28, 2021Levi's Final Petition for Minors Comp
Date: March 26, 2024Aiden's Final Petiton for Minors Comp
Date: March 26, 2024Order Approving Compromise Aiden Moss
Date: March 26, 2024Order Approving Compromise Levi Moss
Date: March 26, 2024MOSS COP
Date: March 26, 2024NoS
Date: February 20, 2024Notice of Settlement of Entire Case
Date: February 13, 2024STIP 2 CONTINUE THE TRIAL #2
Date: January 29, 2024STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL - SIGNED MC1387
Date: January 25, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT-MOSS
Date: April 13, 20222022.04.14 (CMC STATEMENT)
Date: April 14, 2022CMC 4.28.22
Date: April 15, 2022CMC STATEMENT 4.28.22
Date: April 19, 2022CMC STATEMENT [PACKAGE]
Date: April 19, 2022CMC STATEMENT [REVISED PACKAGE]
Date: April 22, 20222022.07.12-SERTICERIC-EC -OUT-CMC STMT FINAL
Date: July 12, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT-MOSS
Date: July 13, 2022CMC_STATEMENT_7_27_22
Date: July 14, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT-MOSS
Date: August 11, 2022317771.1049537.2022.08.11-SERTICERIC-EC -OUT-CMC STATEMENT FINAL
Date: August 12, 2022CMC_8_26_22
Date: August 15, 2022CASE
Date: October 11, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT-MOSS
Date: October 12, 2022CMC_STATEMENT_2_23_23
Date: February 09, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -MOSS
Date: February 09, 2023380876.1326672.10SERTICERICECOUTOPCCMCSTATEMENTFINAL
Date: February 10, 2023JURY FEE
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES. |
|
July 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Jury Trial T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
July 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 07/29/2024 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES. |
|
July 26, 2024 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference JT: 07/29/2024 0930 DIV. J T/E: 7 DAYS. JURY FOR ALL SIDES. Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
July 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1384 as to Complaint in case BCV-21-101449 ONLY cont'd from 03/29/24 |
|
July 10, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1384 as to Complaint in case BCV-21-101449 ONLY cont'd from 03/29/24 Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 as to Complaint in case BCV-19-103330 ONLY |
|
July 01, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal pursuant to CRC 3.1385 as to Complaint in case BCV-19-103330 ONLY Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
June 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 07/29/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days |
|
June 28, 2024 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference Jury Trial set for 07/29/2024 in Div J- Time Estimate 7 Days Judge: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.