Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Martin, Leonard, filed a(n) 08-Cv Civil Rights - Civil Unlimited case against Aaron, Hal, City Of California City, Heller, Jerry, Linn, Anna, represented by Fortin, Kelly A., Sheffield, Andrew K, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management324 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
Category08-Cv Civil Rights - Civil Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions350 days |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
||
Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16
Date: January 03, 2020Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 22, 2020Motion to Amend (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 22, 2020Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: January 22, 2020Motion to Strike (ANTI SLAPP) Per CCP 425.16
Date: January 03, 2020Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: June 15, 2020Motion (Pre-Disposition)
Date: June 15, 2020Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: June 15, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: June 15, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: June 15, 2020Order to Show Cause
Date: September 25, 2019Demurrer First Amended Complaint
Date: June 15, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: June 15, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: August 14, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2020Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2020Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2020Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 11, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: November 04, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2020Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2020Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C) Case Management Conference continued from 08/27/2020 Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Motion to Strike 10/28/2020 Defendant, CITY OF CALIFORNIA CITY Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Motion to Strike 10/28/2020 Defendants, HAL AARON; JERRY HELLER Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Demurrer 10/28/2020 Defendant, ANNA LINN Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Demurrer 10/28/2020 Defendant, HAL AARON; JERRY HELLER Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Demurrer 10/28/2020 Defendant, CITY OF CALIFORNIA CITY Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Demurrer 12/11/2020 Motion to Strike 10/28/2020 Defendant, ANANA LINN Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion to Strike 10/28/2020 Defendants, HAL AARON; JERRY HELLER Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Demurrer 10/28/2020 Defendant, HAL AARON; JERRY HELLER Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Demurrer 10/28/2020 Defendant, ANNA LINN Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.